TN SB0717 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Pub. Ch. 138
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Pub. Ch. 138
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires notice of termination of director of schools to comply with same requirements as notice of extension of a director's contract; requires termination of contract of director of schools to be first item on the agenda of the board meeting at which such action is to be considered. - Amends TCA Section 49-2-203.
Title
As enacted, requires notice of termination of director of schools to comply with same requirements as notice of extension of a director's contract; requires termination of contract of director of schools to be first item on the agenda of the board meeting at which such action is to be considered. - Amends TCA Section 49-2-203.
Sponsors
Sen. Andy Berke [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - Senate - S. ED. COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - Senate - S. ED. COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-10 | Pub. Ch. 138 | |
2011-05-10 | Effective date(s) 05/02/11 | |
2011-05-02 | Signed by Governor. | |
2011-04-20 | Transmitted to Gov. for action. | |
2011-04-20 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2011-04-19 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2011-04-19 | Enrolled and ready for signatures | |
2011-04-18 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | |
2011-04-18 | Passed H., Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 1 | |
2011-04-18 | Subst. for comp. HB. | |
2011-04-18 | Passed S., Ayes 32, Nays 0 | |
2011-04-14 | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 cal. for 4/18/2011 | |
2011-04-13 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm. | |
2011-04-07 | Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 4/13/2011 | |
2011-03-30 | Action Def. in S. Ed. Comm. to 4/20/2011 | |
2011-03-23 | Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 3/30/2011 | |
2011-02-17 | P2C, ref. to S. Ed. Comm. | |
2011-02-16 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-14 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0735 (Crossfiled) 2011-05-10 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 138