TN SB0720 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-19 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-19 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, allocates revenue from occupancy tax imposed by Hamilton County on short-term vacation rental units in the City of Chattanooga to the City to be used solely for improvements to certain city-owned youth and community facilities. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 14; Chapter 444 of the Public Acts of 1983; Chapter 905 of the Public Acts of 1980 and Chapter 918 of the Public Acts of 1988.
Title
As introduced, allocates revenue from occupancy tax imposed by Hamilton County on short-term vacation rental units in the City of Chattanooga to the City to be used solely for improvements to certain city-owned youth and community facilities. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 14; Chapter 444 of the Public Acts of 1983; Chapter 905 of the Public Acts of 1980 and Chapter 918 of the Public Acts of 1988.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-19 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0890 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-28 - Withdrawn.