TN SB0735 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 893
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 893
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises the manner in which fees are determined for persons who identify legatees or distributees of an estate who were not previously identified.
Title
As enacted, revises the manner in which fees are determined for persons who identify legatees or distributees of an estate who were not previously identified.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-13 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-18 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 893 | |
2010-04-22 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - SA1245) | |
2010-04-22 | Comp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file) | |
2010-04-20 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 04/22/2010 | |
2010-04-13 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 1 | |
2010-04-08 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 04/13/2010 | |
2009-02-18 | P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm. | |
2009-02-12 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-11 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0172 (Crossfiled) 2010-05-18 - Pub. Ch. 893