TN SB0735 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-17 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-17 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits Johnson City from raising water rates, on consumers located outside the city limits within Sullivan County, 50 percent or higher than the rate charged to consumers located within the city limits. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 35; Title 7, Chapter 82 and Title 68.
Title
As introduced, prohibits Johnson City from raising water rates, on consumers located outside the city limits within Sullivan County, 50 percent or higher than the rate charged to consumers located within the city limits. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 35; Title 7, Chapter 82 and Title 68.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Green [R] | Rep. Timothy Hill [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-17 | Senate | Withdrawn. |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Recalled from S. S&L Gov. Comm. |
2013-02-06 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm. |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0600 (Crossfiled) 2013-03-12 - Action Def. in Local Government Committee to TACIR
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0735&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/SB0735.pdf |