TN SB0735 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-21 - Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee w/ neutral recommendation
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-21 - Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee w/ neutral recommendation
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, separates the 5 percent tax on unprepared food into a 5 percent tax on fresh produce and meat and a 5 percent tax on all other unprepared food. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6.
Title
As introduced, separates the 5 percent tax on unprepared food into a 5 percent tax on fresh produce and meat and a 5 percent tax on all other unprepared food. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
Sen. Bo Watson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-21 | Senate | Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee w/ neutral recommendation |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/21/2017 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee to 3/22/2017 |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/15/2017 |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee to 3/15/2017 |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/1/2017 |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in FW&M Revenue Subcommittee 3-1-17 |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Refer to Senate Revenue Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0904 (Crossfiled) 2017-03-29 - Def. to Summer Study in Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee