TN SB0741 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-02 - Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 12/1/2020
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-02 - Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 12/1/2020
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes state agencies to provide child care services for state employees, with the department tasked to approve, administer, and coordinate such services. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 8; Title 49 and Title 71.
Title
As introduced, authorizes state agencies to provide child care services for state employees, with the department tasked to approve, administer, and coordinate such services. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 8; Title 49 and Title 71.
Sponsors
Sen. Sara Kyle [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-02 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 12/1/2020 |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 6/2/2020 |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State & Local Government Committee |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/10/2020 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/3/2020 |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/3/2020 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/18/2020 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 2/18/2020 |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/11/2020 |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/2/2019 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/2/2019 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/26/2019 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1207 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-28 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee of State Committee