TN SB0762 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-01-19 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-01-19 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires state treasurer to study current efforts of depositing state funds that provide specific assistance to eligible state depositories that are community banks, and recommend enhanced efforts to the senate and house finance, ways and means committees. - Amends TCA Title 9, Chapter 4.
Title
As introduced, requires state treasurer to study current efforts of depositing state funds that provide specific assistance to eligible state depositories that are community banks, and recommend enhanced efforts to the senate and house finance, ways and means committees. - Amends TCA Title 9, Chapter 4.
Sponsors
Sen. Lowe Finney [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-19 | Withdrawn. | |
2012-01-19 | Recalled from S. F,W&M Comm. | |
2011-05-17 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. FW&M Comm. | |
2011-05-11 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 5/17/2011 | |
2011-04-26 | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to last cal. | |
2011-04-20 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/26/2011 | |
2011-04-19 | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/26/2011 | |
2011-04-13 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/19/2011 | |
2011-04-05 | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/19/2011 | |
2011-03-30 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/5/2011 | |
2011-02-17 | P2C, ref. to S. FW&M Comm. | |
2011-02-16 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-15 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1188 (Crossfiled) 2011-02-23 - P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0762&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/SB0762.pdf |