TN SB0762 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-13 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-13 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes an achievement school district (ASD) operated charter school, operating for at least three years, to be operated by the state board of education if benchmarks agreed upon by the ASD and charter school in the original charter application are met. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1; Title 49, Chapter 13; Title 49, Chapter 2; Title 49, Chapter 7 and Title 49, Chapter 8.
Title
As introduced, authorizes an achievement school district (ASD) operated charter school, operating for at least three years, to be operated by the state board of education if benchmarks agreed upon by the ASD and charter school in the original charter application are met. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1; Title 49, Chapter 13; Title 49, Chapter 2; Title 49, Chapter 7 and Title 49, Chapter 8.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1136 (Crossfiled) 2017-02-15 - Assigned to s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0762&ga=110 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/110/Bill/SB0762.pdf |