TN SB0783 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-30 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 439
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-30 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 439
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, establishes what crimes may be a lesser included offense generally; specifies that second degree murder is a lesser included offense of first degree murder, voluntary manslaughter is a lesser included offense of premeditated first degree murder and second degree murder, aggravated sexual battery is a lesser included offense of aggravated rape, and sexual battery and sexual battery by an authority figure are lesser include offenses of rape and aggravated rape.
Title
As enacted, establishes what crimes may be a lesser included offense generally; specifies that second degree murder is a lesser included offense of first degree murder, voluntary manslaughter is a lesser included offense of premeditated first degree murder and second degree murder, aggravated sexual battery is a lesser included offense of aggravated rape, and sexual battery and sexual battery by an authority figure are lesser include offenses of rape and aggravated rape.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-05-27 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-30 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 439 | |
2009-06-08 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - SA0647) | |
2009-06-08 | Comp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file) | |
2009-06-04 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 06/08/2009 | |
2009-06-04 | S. Reset on cal. for 06/08/2009 | |
2009-06-03 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 06/04/2009 | |
2009-06-03 | S. Reset on Cal. for 6/4/2009 | |
2009-06-02 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 06/03/2009 | |
2009-06-02 | S. Reset on cal. for 6/3/09 | |
2009-05-29 | Placed on Sen. Consent Calendar (2) cal. for 06/02/2009 | |
2009-05-27 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 | |
2009-05-21 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 05/27/2009 | |
2009-05-20 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 5/27/2009 | |
2009-05-20 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 05/20/2009 | |
2009-05-19 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 5/20/2009 | |
2009-05-14 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 05/19/2009 | |
2009-05-13 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 5/19/2009 | |
2009-05-13 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 05/13/2009 | |
2009-05-12 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 5/13/2009 | |
2009-05-07 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 05/12/2009 | |
2009-05-06 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 5/12/2009 | |
2009-05-06 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 05/06/2009 | |
2009-05-05 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 5/6/2009 | |
2009-05-01 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 05/05/2009 | |
2009-04-29 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 5/6/2009 | |
2009-04-23 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 04/29/2009 | |
2009-04-23 | Action def. in S. Jud. Comm. to 4/29/09 | |
2009-04-16 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 04/22/2009 | |
2009-02-18 | P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm. | |
2009-02-12 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-11 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0588 (Crossfiled) 2009-06-30 - Pub. Ch. 439