TN SB0783 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-01 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-01 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, designates the Barrett Model 82A1 rifle as the official state firearm. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 1, Part 3.
Title
As introduced, designates the Barrett Model 82A1 rifle as the official state firearm. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 1, Part 3.
Sponsors
Sen. Mae Beavers [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-01 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/1/2015 |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/31/2015 |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/10/2015 |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0677 (Crossfiled) 2015-04-08 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0783&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/SB0783.pdf |