TN SB0797 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Pub. Ch. 200
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Pub. Ch. 200
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, removes $180 fee for an individual petitioning the court for an expunction of certain criminal offenses; removes $350 fee for a defendant applying for expunction of an offense following the completion of a diversion program. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 32 and Title 40, Chapter 35.
Title
As enacted, removes $180 fee for an individual petitioning the court for an expunction of certain criminal offenses; removes $350 fee for a defendant applying for expunction of an offense following the completion of a diversion program. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 32 and Title 40, Chapter 35.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-10 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | Pub. Ch. 200 | |
2019-05-01 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2019 | |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2019-04-15 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2019-04-10 | House | Passed H., Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2019-04-10 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0134) |
2019-04-10 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2019-04-01 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0063) |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/28/2019 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/26/2019 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 3/26/2019 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/19/2019 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/5/2019 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0941 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 200