TN SB0805 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-2-1)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Pub. Ch. 203
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-2-1)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Pub. Ch. 203
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts the Governor's Investment in Vocational Education Act; specifies that financial assistance received for all dual enrollment courses attempted after the fourth dual enrollment course reduces any subsequent award of the Tennessee HOPE scholarship. - Amends TCA Section 49-4-930.
Title
As enacted, enacts the Governor's Investment in Vocational Education Act; specifies that financial assistance received for all dual enrollment courses attempted after the fourth dual enrollment course reduces any subsequent award of the Tennessee HOPE scholarship. - Amends TCA Section 49-4-930.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-10 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | Pub. Ch. 203 | |
2019-05-01 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2020 | |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2019-04-15 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2019-04-10 | House | Passed H., Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2019-04-10 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0111) |
2019-04-10 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2019-04-01 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 29, Nays 0 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0083) |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/28/2019 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/26/2019 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 3/26/2019 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/19/2019 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/6/2019 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0949 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 203