TN SB0808 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Pub. Ch. 204
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Pub. Ch. 204
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, transfers, from the state board of education to the department of education, the authority to accept and administer federal funds for the purpose of promoting public education; designates the department of education as the state board for career and technical education; grants the department of education the authority to administer annual appropriations made for career and technical education; revises other related provisions. - Amends TCA Section 49-1-202; Title 49, Chapter 11; Section 49-3-201; Section 49-3-302 and Section 49-3-318.
Title
As enacted, transfers, from the state board of education to the department of education, the authority to accept and administer federal funds for the purpose of promoting public education; designates the department of education as the state board for career and technical education; grants the department of education the authority to administer annual appropriations made for career and technical education; revises other related provisions. - Amends TCA Section 49-1-202; Title 49, Chapter 11; Section 49-3-201; Section 49-3-302 and Section 49-3-318.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | Pub. Ch. 204 | |
2019-05-01 | Effective date(s) 04/25/2019 | |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2019-04-17 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2019-04-15 | House | Passed H., Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2019-04-15 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0193) |
2019-04-15 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2019-04-08 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0145) |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/4/2019 |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/2/2019 |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Recalled from Senate Calendar Committee |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/20/2019 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/20/2019 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/13/2019 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0952 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 204