TN SB0824 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-08 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-08 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, clarifies video taken by a law enforcement body camera is a public record open to public inspection; removes termination date on exceptions; provides a process for attorneys to access confidential recordings for use in civil litigation. - Amends TCA Title 10, Chapter 7, Part 5.
Title
As introduced, clarifies video taken by a law enforcement body camera is a public record open to public inspection; removes termination date on exceptions; provides a process for attorneys to access confidential recordings for use in civil litigation. - Amends TCA Title 10, Chapter 7, Part 5.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-08 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0413 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-03 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee of State Committee