TN SB0842 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, establishes parole eligibility after 30 years for persons who committed crimes as juveniles and who were sentenced to greater than 30 years; authorizes parole eligibility after 20 years for such persons if certain conditions met; prohibits sentencing persons to life without parole for crimes committed when a juvenile. - Amends TCA Title 37, Chapter 1, Part 1; Title 39, Chapter 13, Part 2 and Title 40, Chapter 35.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, establishes parole eligibility after 30 years for persons who committed crimes as juveniles and who were sentenced to greater than 30 years; authorizes parole eligibility after 20 years for such persons if certain conditions met; prohibits sentencing persons to life without parole for crimes committed when a juvenile. - Amends TCA Title 37, Chapter 1, Part 1; Title 39, Chapter 13, Part 2 and Title 40, Chapter 35.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-23SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
2019-04-17SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/23/2019
2019-02-11SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2019-02-07SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-05SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0876 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-11 - Assigned to s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback