TN SB0868 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, extends from 10 to 14 days the period by which a licensee must notify the alcoholic beverages commission of any change in ownership of the premises where alcoholic beverages are sold at retail. - Amends TCA Title 57.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, extends from 10 to 14 days the period by which a licensee must notify the alcoholic beverages commission of any change in ownership of the premises where alcoholic beverages are sold at retail. - Amends TCA Title 57.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-09SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
2019-04-02SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/9/2019
2019-02-11SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
2019-02-07SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-06SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1164 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-03 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee of State Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback