TN SB0872 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-26 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-26 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes the use of campaign funds for the payment of fines, fees, and penalties assessed for the violation of campaign finance laws. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 10.
Title
As introduced, authorizes the use of campaign funds for the payment of fines, fees, and penalties assessed for the violation of campaign finance laws. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 10.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-26 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/26/2019 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1484 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-27 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee of Local Committee