TN SB0888 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-24 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-24 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Fair Repair Act." - Amends TCA Title 47, Chapter 18; Title 55 and Title 62.
Title
As introduced, enacts the "Fair Repair Act." - Amends TCA Title 47, Chapter 18; Title 55 and Title 62.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-24 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1382 (Crossfiled) 2018-02-22 - Sponsor(s) Added.