TN SB0914 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, authorizes members of the general assembly and political campaign committees to fundraise during a recess in even-numbered years if the general assembly adjourns before May 15 for a period of not less than 10 calendar days, Sundays excepted; resets campaign contribution limits for candidates for the state senate every two years. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 10, Part 3.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, authorizes members of the general assembly and political campaign committees to fundraise during a recess in even-numbered years if the general assembly adjourns before May 15 for a period of not less than 10 calendar days, Sundays excepted; resets campaign contribution limits for candidates for the state senate every two years. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 10, Part 3.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-08SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee
2019-02-11SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
2019-02-07SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-06SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0505 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-06 - Assigned to s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback