TN SB0923 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Pub. Ch. 181
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Pub. Ch. 181
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, specifies that gasification facilities and pyrolysis facilities are not solid waste facilities or incinerators, post-use polymers and recoverable feedstocks are not solid waste, and gasification facilities and pyrolysis facilities are subject to any other applicable environmental, health, and safety requirements for such facilities. - Amends TCA Title 68, Chapter 211.
Title
As enacted, specifies that gasification facilities and pyrolysis facilities are not solid waste facilities or incinerators, post-use polymers and recoverable feedstocks are not solid waste, and gasification facilities and pyrolysis facilities are subject to any other applicable environmental, health, and safety requirements for such facilities. - Amends TCA Title 68, Chapter 211.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 75 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 69 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - SENATE ENERGY, AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 69 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - SENATE ENERGY, AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | Pub. Ch. 181 | |
2019-05-01 | Effective date(s) 04/23/2019 | |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2019-04-15 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2019-04-08 | House | Passed H., Ayes 75, Nays 16, PNV 1 |
2019-04-08 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0209) |
2019-04-08 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2019-03-28 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0138) |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/25/2019 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 3/20/2019 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee to 3/20/2019 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 3/13/2019 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee to 3/13/2019 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 3/6/2019 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee to 3/13/2019 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 2/27/2019 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0219 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 181