TN SB0933 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-02-18 - P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-02-18 - P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enhances the penalty for abuse of corpse from a Class E felony to a Class C felony when the person causes the death of the person whose corpse is mistreated; adds enhancement factor by which a defendant's sentence can be increased within the appropriate range, that a defendant is convicted of second degree murder and the defendant knowingly mutilates the body of the victim after death. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 40.
Title
As introduced, enhances the penalty for abuse of corpse from a Class E felony to a Class C felony when the person causes the death of the person whose corpse is mistreated; adds enhancement factor by which a defendant's sentence can be increased within the appropriate range, that a defendant is convicted of second degree murder and the defendant knowingly mutilates the body of the victim after death. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 40.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-02-18 | P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm. | |
2009-02-12 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-11 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0029 (Crossfiled) 2010-05-27 - Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 06/02/2010
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0933&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/SB0933.pdf |