TN SB0933 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 527
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 527
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, provides that in a prosecution for any criminal homicide, an appropriate photograph of the victim while still alive will be admissible evidence when offered by the district attorney to show the general appearance and condition of the victim while alive. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 40.
Title
As enacted, provides that in a prosecution for any criminal homicide, an appropriate photograph of the victim while still alive will be admissible evidence when offered by the district attorney to show the general appearance and condition of the victim while alive. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 40.
Sponsors
Sen. Janince Bowling [R] | Sen. Randy McNally [R] | Sen. Kerry Roberts [R] | Sen. Ferrell Haile [R] |
Sen. Mark Norris [R] | Sen. Ken Yager [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-07 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-03 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 527 | |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/21/2015 |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 1 |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/7/2015 |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1342 (Crossfiled) 2015-06-03 - Pub. Ch. 527