TN SB0949 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the department to provide weekly mental health counseling to each child in a detention or shelter care facility; requires mental health providers to be licensed and consider the findings and recommendations of any validated risk and needs assessment or individualized case plan relevant to the child. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 33; Title 37; Title 56; Title 63; Title 71 and Chapter 1052 of the Public Acts of 2018.
Title
As introduced, requires the department to provide weekly mental health counseling to each child in a detention or shelter care facility; requires mental health providers to be licensed and consider the findings and recommendations of any validated risk and needs assessment or individualized case plan relevant to the child. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 33; Title 37; Title 56; Title 63; Title 71 and Chapter 1052 of the Public Acts of 2018.
Sponsors
Sen. Sara Kyle [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0988 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-02 - Def. to Summer Study in Children & Families Subcommittee