TN SB1005 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-09 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-09 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires residential landlords and sellers of residential homes to provide lessees or buyers with the location and contact information for the office of the county election commission and a voter registration form. - Amends TCA Title 2.
Title
As introduced, requires residential landlords and sellers of residential homes to provide lessees or buyers with the location and contact information for the office of the county election commission and a voter registration form. - Amends TCA Title 2.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-09 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1221 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-06 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee of Local Committee