TN SB1012 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-25 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. T&S Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-25 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. T&S Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Tennessee Transportation Challenge Grant Act of 2011." - Amends TCA Title 54, Chapter 2.
Title
As introduced, enacts the "Tennessee Transportation Challenge Grant Act of 2011." - Amends TCA Title 54, Chapter 2.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Faulk [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-25 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. T&S Comm. | |
2012-01-18 | Placed on S. T&S Comm. cal. for 1/25/2012 | |
2012-01-12 | Placed on S. T&S Comm. cal. for 1/18/2012 | |
2011-04-13 | Action def. in S. Trans. Comm. to 1st cal of 2012 | |
2011-04-07 | Placed on S. Trans Comm. cal. for 4/13/2011 | |
2011-03-30 | Action Def. in S. Trans Comm. to 4/13/2011 | |
2011-03-23 | Placed on S. Trans Comm. cal. for 3/30/2011 | |
2011-02-23 | P2C, ref. to S. Trans Comm. | |
2011-02-17 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-16 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1857 (Crossfiled) 2011-03-01 - Assigned to s/c General Sub of Transportation
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB1012&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/SB1012.pdf |