TN SB1012 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-02 - Pub. Ch. 498
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-02 - Pub. Ch. 498
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, permits a permanent legal resident of the United States who is an honorably discharged veteran of the United States armed forces to be employed as a police officer; requires such an officer to apply for or obtain citizenship within six years of the employment start date. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 8 and Title 38, Chapter 8, Part 1.
Title
As enacted, permits a permanent legal resident of the United States who is an honorably discharged veteran of the United States armed forces to be employed as a police officer; requires such an officer to apply for or obtain citizenship within six years of the employment start date. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 8 and Title 38, Chapter 8, Part 1.
Sponsors
Sen. Steven Dickerson [R] | Sen. Richard Briggs [R] | Sen. Todd Gardenhire [R] | Sen. Lee Harris [D] |
Sen. Becky Massey [R] | Sen. Jeff Yarbro [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT CONFERENCE COMMITTEE REPORT (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 2 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 2 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-02 | Pub. Ch. 498 | |
2015-06-02 | Effective date(s) 05/20/2015 | |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2015-05-08 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2015-04-22 | House | Conf. comm. report adopted, Ayes 94, Nays 0 |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Conference Committee report adopted, Ayes 27, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2015-04-22 | House | Conf. comm. appointed. (Powell, Ramsey, Lamberth) |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Conference Committee appointed. (Dickerson, Overbey, Harris) |
2015-04-22 | House | H. refused to recede from am. no. 1 |
2015-04-22 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar 2 for 4/22/2015 |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Refused to concur, (Amendment 2 - HA0414) |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Refused to concur, (Amendment 1 - HA0413) |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar 2 calendar for 4/22/2015 |
2015-04-21 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2015-04-21 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA0414) |
2015-04-21 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0413) |
2015-04-21 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2015-04-13 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 25, Nays 4, PNV 1 |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0301) |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/9/2015 |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 2 PNV 0 |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/31/2015 |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/31/2015 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/17/2015 |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0765 (Crossfiled) 2015-06-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 498