TN SB1012 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Pub. Ch. 260
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Pub. Ch. 260
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, allows a student to be excused from a school athletic event if the event occurs on an official school holiday, observed day of worship, or religious holiday and the parent or legal guardian provides prior written notice of the student's absence; authorizes an unforeseen emergency as exception to the parent or legal guardian providing prior written notice of the student's absence from the athletic event. - Amends TCA Section 49-6-1002.
Title
As enacted, allows a student to be excused from a school athletic event if the event occurs on an official school holiday, observed day of worship, or religious holiday and the parent or legal guardian provides prior written notice of the student's absence; authorizes an unforeseen emergency as exception to the parent or legal guardian providing prior written notice of the student's absence from the athletic event. - Amends TCA Section 49-6-1002.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-17 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN HOUSE AMEND# 1 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 81 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 81 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-11 | Pub. Ch. 260 | |
2017-05-11 | Effective date(s) 05/02/2017 | |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2017-04-25 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 28, Nays 0 (Amendment 1 - HA0268) |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar calendar for 4/17/2017 |
2017-04-10 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 81, Nays 11, PNV 0 |
2017-04-10 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0268) |
2017-04-10 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2017-03-16 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0100) |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/13/2017 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/8/2017 |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/8/2017 |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/1/2017 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1063 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-11 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 260