TN SB1012 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires each county election commission, no later than January 1, 2020, to utilize precinct-based optical scanners for elections. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 20.
Title
As introduced, requires each county election commission, no later than January 1, 2020, to utilize precinct-based optical scanners for elections. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 20.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1432 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-27 - Failed for lack of second in: Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee