TN SB1030 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires the department to provide a written report to the judiciary committees of the senate and the house, the state and local government committee of the senate, and the state government committee of the house by February 1, 2020, and by February 1 each year thereafter, detailing the institutional efficiency modifications made at each correctional facility and private contract prison in this state the prior year. - Amends TCA Title 41.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, requires the department to provide a written report to the judiciary committees of the senate and the house, the state and local government committee of the senate, and the state government committee of the house by February 1, 2020, and by February 1 each year thereafter, detailing the institutional efficiency modifications made at each correctional facility and private contract prison in this state the prior year. - Amends TCA Title 41.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-27SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee
2019-02-11SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
2019-02-07SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-06SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1222 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-26 - Failed in s/c Corrections Subcommittee of State Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback