TN SB1031 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, reduces from 10 to five business days within which the commissioner of correction must provide a report to the senator and representative of a constituent in their district who died in the custody of the department at a department facility. - Amends TCA Title 4.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, reduces from 10 to five business days within which the commissioner of correction must provide a report to the senator and representative of a constituent in their district who died in the custody of the department at a department facility. - Amends TCA Title 4.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-09SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
2019-04-02SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/9/2019
2019-02-11SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
2019-02-07SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-06SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1282 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-11 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback