TN SB1053 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-16 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-16 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Main Street Historic Tourism and Revitalization Act." - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 11, Part 1; Title 56, Chapter 4 and Title 67.
Title
As introduced, enacts the "Main Street Historic Tourism and Revitalization Act." - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 11, Part 1; Title 56, Chapter 4 and Title 67.
Sponsors
Sen. Bo Watson [R] | Sen. Brian Kelsey [R] | Sen. Rusty Crowe [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 4/16/2019 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 4/16/2019 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 4/9/2019 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1063 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-24 - Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/29/2019