TN SB1058 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 453
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 453
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises various provisions of the Tennessee Community Schools Act. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 24.
Title
As enacted, revises various provisions of the Tennessee Community Schools Act. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 24.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-17 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-17 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 453 | |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/30/2019 |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/30/2019 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/29/2019 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar 4/29/19 |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/25/2019 |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 4/17/2019 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 4/17/2019 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 4/10/2019 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 4/10/2019 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 4/3/2019 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 4/3/2019 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/27/2019 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/27/2019 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/20/2019 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1330 (Crossfiled) 2019-06-17 - Pub. Ch. 453