TN SB1060 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 761
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, authorizes nonphysician healthcare providers who are otherwise permitted to prescribe Schedule II or III drugs to also prescribe a buprenorphine product for the treatment of opioid use disorder if certain requirements met. - Amends TCA Title 33; Title 53; Title 63 and Title 68.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, authorizes nonphysician healthcare providers who are otherwise permitted to prescribe Schedule II or III drugs to also prescribe a buprenorphine product for the treatment of opioid use disorder if certain requirements met. - Amends TCA Title 33; Title 53; Title 63 and Title 68.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-02 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 761
2020-06-11SenateCompanion House Bill substituted
2020-06-10SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 6/11/2020
2020-03-16SenateRe-refer to Senate Cal. Comm.
2020-03-13SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/16/2020
2020-03-11SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 0
2020-03-09SenatePlaced on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/11/2020
2020-03-09SenateAction deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/11/2020
2020-03-05SenatePlaced on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/9/2020
2019-04-10SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health and Welfare Committee
2019-04-04SenatePlaced on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 4/10/2019
2019-04-03SenateAction deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 4/10/2019
2019-03-27SenatePlaced on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 4/3/2019
2019-02-11SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee
2019-02-07SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-06SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0656 (Crossfiled) 2020-07-02 - Pub. Ch. 761

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback