TN SB1063 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-18 - Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/18/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-18 - Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/18/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes certain state security personnel certified by the peace officer standards and training commission (POST) to receive the same retirement benefits as the highway patrol and other state police officers. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 3; Title 4, Chapter 7; Title 8, Chapter 35; Title 8, Chapter 36, Part 2 and Title 38, Chapter 8.
Title
As introduced, authorizes certain state security personnel certified by the peace officer standards and training commission (POST) to receive the same retirement benefits as the highway patrol and other state police officers. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 3; Title 4, Chapter 7; Title 8, Chapter 35; Title 8, Chapter 36, Part 2 and Title 38, Chapter 8.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-18 | Senate | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/18/2013 |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/17/2013 |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/17/2013 |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/16/2013 |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/16/2013 |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/15/2013 |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/15/2013 |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/11/2013 |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/11/2013 |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/10/2013 |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/10/2013 |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/9/2013 |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/9/2013 |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/8/2013 |
2013-02-06 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. FW&M Comm. |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0842 (Crossfiled) 2013-03-27 - Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 2014
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB1063&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/SB1063.pdf |