TN SB1063 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-28 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-28 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires nonpartisan elections for state trial court judges and county judicial offices, effective January 1, 2021; requires the incumbent officer to be listed first on the election ballot if the incumbent qualifies for the election. - Amends TCA Title 2.
Title
As introduced, requires nonpartisan elections for state trial court judges and county judicial offices, effective January 1, 2021; requires the incumbent officer to be listed first on the election ballot if the incumbent qualifies for the election. - Amends TCA Title 2.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/19/2019 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/26/2019 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1494 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-13 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee of Local Committee