TN SB1114 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, creates the state government advisory task force on community resilience. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 68.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, creates the state government advisory task force on community resilience. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 68.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-16SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
2019-04-10SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/16/2019
2019-04-10SenateAction deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/16/2019
2019-04-09SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/10/2019
2019-04-09SenateAction deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/10/2019
2019-04-02SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/9/2019
2019-03-27SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 0
2019-03-20SenatePlaced on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 3/27/2019
2019-02-11SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee
2019-02-07SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-06SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1120 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-09 - Action def. in State Committee to TACIR

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback