TN SB1118 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-05 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-05 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, imposes a penalty on retailers that sell beer of less than 10.1 percent alcohol by volume at a price less than 5 percent below the cost to the retailer. - Amends TCA Title 57, Chapter 5.
Title
As introduced, imposes a penalty on retailers that sell beer of less than 10.1 percent alcohol by volume at a price less than 5 percent below the cost to the retailer. - Amends TCA Title 57, Chapter 5.
Sponsors
Sen. Rusty Crowe [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/5/2019 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1297 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-09 - Withdrawn.