TN SB1127 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes a municipality to seek reimbursement for expenses from the office of the comptroller relating to an employee obtaining the designation of certified municipal finance officer; authorizes comptroller to reimburse the municipality as funds are available for such purpose. - Amends TCA Title 6, Chapter 56, Part 4.
Title
As introduced, authorizes a municipality to seek reimbursement for expenses from the office of the comptroller relating to an employee obtaining the designation of certified municipal finance officer; authorizes comptroller to reimburse the municipality as funds are available for such purpose. - Amends TCA Title 6, Chapter 56, Part 4.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1045 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-13 - Assigned to s/c Cities & Counties Subcommittee