TN SB1162 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, reduces from 20 percent to 15 percent the threshold decennial county growth rate required before a county is authorized to levy a privilege tax on persons and entities engaged in residential development of property to provide the county with an additional source of funding to defray the cost of providing school facilities. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 29.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, reduces from 20 percent to 15 percent the threshold decennial county growth rate required before a county is authorized to levy a privilege tax on persons and entities engaged in residential development of property to provide the county with an additional source of funding to defray the cost of providing school facilities. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 29.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-16SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
2019-04-10SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/16/2019
2019-02-11SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
2019-02-07SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-06SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1488 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-13 - Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback