TN SB1224 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits local governments after the effective date of the act from entering into or renewing a contract for the operation of a private prison. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 6; Title 7 and Title 41.
Title
As introduced, prohibits local governments after the effective date of the act from entering into or renewing a contract for the operation of a private prison. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 6; Title 7 and Title 41.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1212 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-11 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.