TN SB1231 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Pub. Ch. 283
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Pub. Ch. 283
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes the development of curriculum for work-based learning in labor education alignment program. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 7, Part 12.
Title
As enacted, authorizes the development of curriculum for work-based learning in labor education alignment program. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 7, Part 12.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-27 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN HOUSE AMEND# 1 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-11 | Pub. Ch. 283 | |
2017-05-11 | Effective date(s) 05/04/2017 | |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2017-04-27 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 29, Nays 0 (Amendment 1 - HA0258) |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar calendar for 4/27/2017 |
2017-04-24 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2017-04-24 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0258) |
2017-04-24 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2017-03-09 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 3/6/2017 |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/1/2017 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0445 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-11 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 283