TN SB1231 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-02 - Companion House Bill substituted
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-02 - Companion House Bill substituted
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, reduces the amount of time from 30 to 21 days a lobbyist or an employer of a lobbyist has to notify the Tennessee ethics commission following an in-state event to which invitations were extended to the entire membership of the general assembly and thus not subject to the prohibition on gifts. - Amends TCA Title 2 and Title 3.
Title
As introduced, reduces the amount of time from 30 to 21 days a lobbyist or an employer of a lobbyist has to notify the Tennessee ethics commission following an in-state event to which invitations were extended to the entire membership of the general assembly and thus not subject to the prohibition on gifts. - Amends TCA Title 2 and Title 3.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-01 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-02 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 5/2/2019 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar 2 for 5/1/2019 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/1/2019 |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/1/2019 |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/30/2019 |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/30/2019 |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/29/2019 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/29/2019 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/25/2019 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/25/2019 |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/24/2019 |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/24/2019 |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2019 |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 0 |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/17/2019 |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/17/2019 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/16/2019 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1232 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-02 - Conference Committee appointed. (Watson, Johnson, Yager, Yarbro)