TN SB1237 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Pub. Ch. 362
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, makes police officers and firefighters who are members of the state retirement system eligible for service retirement upon completion of 25 years of creditable service. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 34; Title 8, Chapter 35; Title 8, Chapter 36 and Title 8, Chapter 37.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, makes police officers and firefighters who are members of the state retirement system eligible for service retirement upon completion of 25 years of creditable service. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 34; Title 8, Chapter 35; Title 8, Chapter 36 and Title 8, Chapter 37.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Concur House Amendment # 2 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15 Pub. Ch. 362
2019-05-15 Effective date(s) 01/01/2020
2019-05-10SenateSigned by Governor.
2019-05-01SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2019-05-01HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2019-04-30SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2019-04-25SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2019-04-24SenateConcurred, Ayes 27, Nays 0 (Amendment 2 - HA0312)
2019-04-22SenatePlaced on Senate Message Calendar for 4/24/2019
2019-04-22HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 0
2019-04-22HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA0312)
2019-04-22HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0066)
2019-04-22HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2019-04-01HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2019-04-01SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2019-03-28SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 29, Nays 0
2019-03-26SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/28/2019
2019-03-25SenateSenate Reset on calendar for 3/28/2019
2019-03-25SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0091)
2019-03-22SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/25/2019
2019-03-19SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2019-03-13SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/19/2019
2019-02-11SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2019-02-07SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-07SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0623 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 362

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback