TN SB1248 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 450
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 450
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires the department of education and public schools to commemorate the centennial of women's suffrage and recognize the Tennesseans who were instrumental in securing all women the right to vote for the purpose of educating students about the ratification of the nineteenth amendment to the United States Constitution on August 18, 1920, and to educate students on the state of Tennessee's fundamental role in guaranteeing all women the right to vote. - Amends TCA Section 49-6-1028.
Title
As enacted, requires the department of education and public schools to commemorate the centennial of women's suffrage and recognize the Tennesseans who were instrumental in securing all women the right to vote for the purpose of educating students about the ratification of the nineteenth amendment to the United States Constitution on August 18, 1920, and to educate students on the state of Tennessee's fundamental role in guaranteeing all women the right to vote. - Amends TCA Section 49-6-1028.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-17 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 450 | |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/30/2019 |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 4/17/2019 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 4/17/2019 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 4/10/2019 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1192 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 450