TN SB1264 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Pub. Ch. 271
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Pub. Ch. 271
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, prohibits a person convicted of voter fraud in any state from assisting a person with voting in this state, including early voting and by absentee ballot. - Amends TCA Title 2.
Title
As enacted, prohibits a person convicted of voter fraud in any state from assisting a person with voting in this state, including early voting and by absentee ballot. - Amends TCA Title 2.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-17 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommend for passage (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommend for passage (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | Pub. Ch. 271 | |
2019-05-09 | Effective date(s) 04/30/2019 | |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2019-04-22 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2019-04-17 | House | Passed H., Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2019-04-17 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2019-03-04 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Floor Session calendar for 2/28/2019 |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/26/2019 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0860 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 271