TN SB1293 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-11 - Failed in Senate State and Local Government Committee / no second
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires the fiscal review committee to hear appeals from legislators related to fiscal notes produced by the committee; requires the committee to develop and adopt a formal appeal process. - Amends TCA Title 3, Chapter 2 and Title 3, Chapter 7.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, requires the fiscal review committee to hear appeals from legislators related to fiscal notes produced by the committee; requires the committee to develop and adopt a formal appeal process. - Amends TCA Title 3, Chapter 2 and Title 3, Chapter 7.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-11SenateFailed in Senate State and Local Government Committee / no second
2020-02-04SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/11/2020
2019-04-09SenateAction deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 2020
2019-04-02SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/9/2019
2019-03-26SenateAction deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/9/2019
2019-03-19SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/26/2019
2019-02-11SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
2019-02-07SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-07SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0544 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-18 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback