TN SB1303 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-19 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-19 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires a person to declare a statewide political party affiliation before voting in a primary election. - Amends TCA Title 2.
Title
As introduced, requires a person to declare a statewide political party affiliation before voting in a primary election. - Amends TCA Title 2.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Pody [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-19 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/19/2019 |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/19/2019 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/26/2019 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1398 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-13 - Failed in Local Committee