TN SB1318 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-02 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-02 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits both the driver and the passengers in a motor vehicle from consuming an alcoholic beverage or possessing an open container in the passenger area and creates an administrative, rather than judicial, process to revoke the driver license of a person charged with a DUI violation or other criminal offenses. - Amends TCA Title 39; Title 40; Title 50 and Title 55.
Title
As introduced, prohibits both the driver and the passengers in a motor vehicle from consuming an alcoholic beverage or possessing an open container in the passenger area and creates an administrative, rather than judicial, process to revoke the driver license of a person charged with a DUI violation or other criminal offenses. - Amends TCA Title 39; Title 40; Title 50 and Title 55.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-02 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/7/2015 |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Reset on Final calendar of Senate Judiciary Committee |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/17/2015 |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1193 (Crossfiled) 2016-01-27 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c State Government Subcommittee of State Government Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB1318&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/SB1318.pdf |