TN SB1318 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-19 - Pub. Ch. 155
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-19 - Pub. Ch. 155
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, clarifies that property assessors may retain electronic or digital copies of property tax exemption applications to comply with existing retention requirement. - Amends TCA Section 67-5-212.
Title
As enacted, clarifies that property assessors may retain electronic or digital copies of property tax exemption applications to comply with existing retention requirement. - Amends TCA Section 67-5-212.
Sponsors
Sen. Rusty Crowe [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-13 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-19 | Pub. Ch. 155 | |
2017-04-19 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2017 | |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2017-04-06 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2017-04-03 | House | Passed H., Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2017-04-03 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2017-03-16 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 3/13/2017 |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/7/2017 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0086 (Crossfiled) 2017-04-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 155