TN SB1337 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 139
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 139
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes the chief law enforcement officer of a state or local law enforcement agency to establish policies regarding off-duty use of law enforcement vehicles to provide an enhanced security presence at vulnerable locations, which include places of worship, schools, and parks. - Amends TCA Title 38, Chapter 3.
Title
As enacted, authorizes the chief law enforcement officer of a state or local law enforcement agency to establish policies regarding off-duty use of law enforcement vehicles to provide an enhanced security presence at vulnerable locations, which include places of worship, schools, and parks. - Amends TCA Title 38, Chapter 3.
Sponsors
Sen. Steve Southerland [R] | Sen. Ferrell Haile [R] | Sen. Janince Bowling [R] | Sen. Mark Pody [R] |
Sen. Paul Rose [R] | Sen. Ken Yager [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-19 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-15 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 139 | |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/18/2019 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 3/18/2019 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Floor Session calendar for 3/14/2019 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Re-refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Floor Session calendar for 3/7/2019 |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 3/7/2019 |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Floor Session calendar for 3/4/2019 |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 3/4/2019 |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Floor Session calendar for 2/28/2019 |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 1 |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/19/2019 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1318 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-15 - Pub. Ch. 139